THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:22:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Christian Medical College, Ludhiana, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 182 Pinebush Road
Suite 201
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196212424
Fax: 18555306121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nirmala Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Joseph (CPSO#: 120860 )
Business Address: 182 Pinebush Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8J8
5196212424

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Christian Medical College, Ludhiana, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 182 Pinebush Road
Suite 201
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196212424
Fax: 18555306121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nirmala Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Joseph (CPSO#: 120860 )
Business Address: 182 Pinebush Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8J8
5196212424

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIRMALA JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIRMALA JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Christian Medical College, Ludhiana, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020