THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:34:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nairobi, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 652 0606
Fax: 416-652-0633
Address: 2-19101B Leslie St
Sharon ON L0G 1V0
Phone: 905-478-1303
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mudassir Salyani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salyani (CPSO#: 120870 )
Business Address: 18 Kensington Rd
Suite 203
Brampton ON L6T 4S5
Business Address: 1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M1
(416) 652-5500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nairobi, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 652 0606
Fax: 416-652-0633
Address: 2-19101B Leslie St
Sharon ON L0G 1V0
Phone: 905-478-1303
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mudassir Salyani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salyani (CPSO#: 120870 )
Business Address: 18 Kensington Rd
Suite 203
Brampton ON L6T 4S5
Business Address: 1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M1
(416) 652-5500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUDASSIR SALYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALYANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUDASSIR SALYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALYANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nairobi, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2020