THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19101B Leslie St
York Weight Loss & Internal Medicine
Sharon ON L0G 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-905-478-1303
Fax: 1-833-694-1522
Address: 200-931 Commissioners Rd E
Peak Sleep Clinic
Clinic
London ON N5Z 3H9
Phone: 9053383331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Attalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Attalla (CPSO#: 120915 )
Business Address: 21 - 120 Vineberg Dr
Hamilton ON L8W 0B5
(905) 478-1300
Business Address: 19101 Leslie St
Sharon ON L0G 1V0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19101B Leslie St
York Weight Loss & Internal Medicine
Sharon ON L0G 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-905-478-1303
Fax: 1-833-694-1522
Address: 200-931 Commissioners Rd E
Peak Sleep Clinic
Clinic
London ON N5Z 3H9
Phone: 9053383331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Attalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Attalla (CPSO#: 120915 )
Business Address: 21 - 120 Vineberg Dr
Hamilton ON L8W 0B5
(905) 478-1300
Business Address: 19101 Leslie St
Sharon ON L0G 1V0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID AMIR ATTALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTALLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID AMIR ATTALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTALLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2020