THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:00:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Dublin School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-2409 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4P 2E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-785-5001
Fax: 416-785-6539
Address: 100-13291 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Gerber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gerber (CPSO#: 120921 )
Business Address: 301-2409 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7
4167855001

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Dublin School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-2409 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4P 2E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-785-5001
Fax: 416-785-6539
Address: 100-13291 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Gerber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gerber (CPSO#: 120921 )
Business Address: 301-2409 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7
4167855001

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE HAYLEY GERBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERBER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE HAYLEY GERBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERBER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Dublin School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020