THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:55:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jefferson Hayre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hayre (CPSO#: 120931 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jefferson Hayre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hayre (CPSO#: 120931 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFERSON ALEXANDER HAYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFERSON ALEXANDER HAYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2020