THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: New York Medical College, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 622 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474831502
Fax: 6474800909
Address: 622 Bloor St W
Bloorkids
Toronto ON M6G 1K7
Phone: 6474831502
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Bregman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bregman (CPSO#: 120937 )
Business Address: 622 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1K7
6474831502

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: New York Medical College, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 622 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474831502
Fax: 6474800909
Address: 622 Bloor St W
Bloorkids
Toronto ON M6G 1K7
Phone: 6474831502
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Bregman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bregman (CPSO#: 120937 )
Business Address: 622 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1K7
6474831502

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACEY BREGMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREGMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACEY BREGMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREGMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: New York Medical College, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020