THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 10:39:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Hawaii, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Westend Family Care Clinic
Ottawa ON K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-599-3321
Fax: 613-599-3366
Address: 2179 Elmira Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 3S1
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Qian Bian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Bian (CPSO#: 120944 )
Business Address: 80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2M 1P6
6135993321

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Hawaii, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Westend Family Care Clinic
Ottawa ON K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-599-3321
Fax: 613-599-3366
Address: 2179 Elmira Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 3S1
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Qian Bian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Bian (CPSO#: 120944 )
Business Address: 80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2M 1P6
6135993321

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QIAN BIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QIAN BIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Hawaii, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020