THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:32:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Center
1450 Durham regional Hwy 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-3539
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. SAEED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Saeed (CPSO#: 120972 )
Business Address: 1450 Durham Regional Highway 2
Courtice Health Center
1450 Durham Region Hwy 2
2nd Floor
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
905 721 3539

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Center
1450 Durham regional Hwy 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-3539
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. SAEED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Saeed (CPSO#: 120972 )
Business Address: 1450 Durham Regional Highway 2
Courtice Health Center
1450 Durham Region Hwy 2
2nd Floor
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
905 721 3539

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISHA SAEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISHA SAEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Oct 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020