THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:38:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rufus Guinchard Health Centre
P.O. Box 40
Port Saunders NL A0K 4H0
Phone: (709) 861-3139
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hissan Butt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Butt (CPSO#: 121014 )
Business Address: PO Box 10008 Rpo Lincoln Green
Mississauga ON L5K 0A7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rufus Guinchard Health Centre
P.O. Box 40
Port Saunders NL A0K 4H0
Phone: (709) 861-3139
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hissan Butt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Butt (CPSO#: 121014 )
Business Address: PO Box 10008 Rpo Lincoln Green
Mississauga ON L5K 0A7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HISSAN BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HISSAN BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020