THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:07:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
Emergency Department
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-445-2550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BRANDON BELBECK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Belbeck (CPSO#: 121044 )
Business Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
5196312030
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
Emergency Department
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-445-2550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BRANDON BELBECK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Belbeck (CPSO#: 121044 )
Business Address: 189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
5196312030
Business Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRANDON SCOTT BELBECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELBECK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRANDON SCOTT BELBECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELBECK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020