THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:11:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1229 Queen Street West
Parkdale Queen West Community Health Centre
Parkdale Site
Toronto Ontario M6K 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416‑537‑2455
Fax: 416‑537‑3526
Address: 489 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1A5
Phone: 416-323-9986
Fax: 416-323-0447
Address: 145 Front Street East
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto Ontario M5A 1E3
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisha Kansal Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kansal (CPSO#: 121088 )
Business Address: PO Box 30001 Rpo New Westminster
Thornhill ON L4J 0C6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1229 Queen Street West
Parkdale Queen West Community Health Centre
Parkdale Site
Toronto Ontario M6K 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416‑537‑2455
Fax: 416‑537‑3526
Address: 489 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1A5
Phone: 416-323-9986
Fax: 416-323-0447
Address: 145 Front Street East
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto Ontario M5A 1E3
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisha Kansal Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kansal (CPSO#: 121088 )
Business Address: PO Box 30001 Rpo New Westminster
Thornhill ON L4J 0C6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISHA KIRAN KANSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANSAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISHA KIRAN KANSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANSAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020