THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:51:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-2683 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 299-0710
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 202-1105 Kingston Rd
Pickering ON L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-1501 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1P 4T6
Phone: (416) 439-0163
Fax: 416-439-7609
Address: 1145 Morningside Ave
Scarborough ON M1B 0A7
Phone: (647) 352-3621
Fax: 647-352-3628
Address: 29 Toronto Street South
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1V9
Phone: (905) 852-3339
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdullah Cader Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cader (CPSO#: 121093 )
Business Address: 5-2683 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2S2
(416) 299-0710

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-2683 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 299-0710
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 202-1105 Kingston Rd
Pickering ON L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-1501 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1P 4T6
Phone: (416) 439-0163
Fax: 416-439-7609
Address: 1145 Morningside Ave
Scarborough ON M1B 0A7
Phone: (647) 352-3621
Fax: 647-352-3628
Address: 29 Toronto Street South
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1V9
Phone: (905) 852-3339
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdullah Cader Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cader (CPSO#: 121093 )
Business Address: 5-2683 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2S2
(416) 299-0710

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH CADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CADER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH CADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CADER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020