THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:20:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third Street
Niagara Health System: Welland Site
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: 905-788-0046
Address: 4500 Queen St
P.O. Box 1
Niagara Falls ON L2E 2L5
Phone: 905-394-0154
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 Facer Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 5H3
Phone: 289-362-1301
Fax: 289-362-5429
Address: 65 Third Street
Niagara Health System: Welland Site
Complex Care Unit
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Phone: 905-732-5434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jul 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Davies-Shawhyde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Davies-Shawhyde (CPSO#: 121109 )
Business Address: 4796 Victoria Ave
Niagara Falls ON L2E 4C2
Business Address: 400 Scott St
St Catharines ON L2M 3W4
Business Address: 4500 Queen St
P.O. Box 1
Niagara Falls ON L2E 2L5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third Street
Niagara Health System: Welland Site
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: 905-788-0046
Address: 4500 Queen St
P.O. Box 1
Niagara Falls ON L2E 2L5
Phone: 905-394-0154
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 Facer Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 5H3
Phone: 289-362-1301
Fax: 289-362-5429
Address: 65 Third Street
Niagara Health System: Welland Site
Complex Care Unit
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Phone: 905-732-5434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jul 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Davies-Shawhyde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Davies-Shawhyde (CPSO#: 121109 )
Business Address: 4796 Victoria Ave
Niagara Falls ON L2E 4C2
Business Address: 400 Scott St
St Catharines ON L2M 3W4
Business Address: 4500 Queen St
P.O. Box 1
Niagara Falls ON L2E 2L5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICK DAVIES-SHAWHYDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES-SHAWHYDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICK DAVIES-SHAWHYDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES-SHAWHYDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2020