THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:42:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Water Street
PO Box 10
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 567-2224
Fax: (705) 567-3838

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Blanche River Health Englehart
HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. LASHA GORECKI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gorecki (CPSO#: 121155 )
Business Address: PO Box 1110
63 Fifth Street
Englehart ON P0J 1H0
7055442321

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Water Street
PO Box 10
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 567-2224
Fax: (705) 567-3838

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Blanche River Health Englehart
HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. LASHA GORECKI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gorecki (CPSO#: 121155 )
Business Address: PO Box 1110
63 Fifth Street
Englehart ON P0J 1H0
7055442321

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LASHA DAWN GORECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORECKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LASHA DAWN GORECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORECKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020