THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:31:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-66 Josephine St
Near North Medical Clinic
North Bay ON P1B 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-495-2685
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Apr 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Moreau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Moreau (CPSO#: 121164 )
Business Address: 201-66 Josephine St
North Bay ON P1B 0A7
705-495-2685

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-66 Josephine St
Near North Medical Clinic
North Bay ON P1B 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-495-2685
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Apr 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Moreau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Moreau (CPSO#: 121164 )
Business Address: 201-66 Josephine St
North Bay ON P1B 0A7
705-495-2685

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE DAWN MOREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE DAWN MOREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020