THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:09:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 70 Spine Road
St. Joseph's General Hospital
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-848-7181
Extension: 2403
Fax: 705-848-9371
Address: 70 Spine Road
St. Joseph's General Hospital
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
Phone: 705-848-7181
Extension: 2403
Fax: 705-848-9371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St. Joseph's General Hospital - Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
HOSPITAL: St. Joseph's General Hospital - Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Athina Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nelson (CPSO#: 121175 )
Business Address: 70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
(705) 848-7181 Extn: 2242

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 70 Spine Road
St. Joseph's General Hospital
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-848-7181
Extension: 2403
Fax: 705-848-9371
Address: 70 Spine Road
St. Joseph's General Hospital
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
Phone: 705-848-7181
Extension: 2403
Fax: 705-848-9371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St. Joseph's General Hospital - Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
HOSPITAL: St. Joseph's General Hospital - Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Athina Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nelson (CPSO#: 121175 )
Business Address: 70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
(705) 848-7181 Extn: 2242

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ATHINA ROSANNA NELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NELSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ATHINA ROSANNA NELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NELSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Mar 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020