THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:10:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Emergency Department
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 245 1550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Rowe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rowe (CPSO#: 121207 )
Business Address: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Address: 80 Grand Ave W
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Chatham ON N7L 1B7
Business Address: 325 Margaret Ave
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Wallaceburg ON N8A 2A7
Business Address: 241 Eighth St
Lady Minto Hospital
Cochrane ON P0L 1C0
Business Address: 29 Noxon St
Alexandra Hospital
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Emergency Department
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 245 1550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Rowe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rowe (CPSO#: 121207 )
Business Address: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Address: 80 Grand Ave W
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Chatham ON N7L 1B7
Business Address: 325 Margaret Ave
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Wallaceburg ON N8A 2A7
Business Address: 241 Eighth St
Lady Minto Hospital
Cochrane ON P0L 1C0
Business Address: 29 Noxon St
Alexandra Hospital
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW MCLAUGHLIN ROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW MCLAUGHLIN ROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020