THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Peninsula College of Med. & Dentistry, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 511-330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-597-2080
Fax: 365-525-2000
Address: 210-2330 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1T 0A2
Phone: 4163351717
Fax: 4163351719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 03 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Jeffrey Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tam (CPSO#: 121215 )
Business Address: 210-2330 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1T 0A2
Business Address: 511-330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
905-597-2080

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Peninsula College of Med. & Dentistry, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 511-330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-597-2080
Fax: 365-525-2000
Address: 210-2330 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1T 0A2
Phone: 4163351717
Fax: 4163351719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 03 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Jeffrey Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tam (CPSO#: 121215 )
Business Address: 210-2330 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1T 0A2
Business Address: 511-330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
905-597-2080

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JEFFREY TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JEFFREY TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Peninsula College of Med. & Dentistry, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2020