THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:24:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Huron St W
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LACH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lach (CPSO#: 121233 )
Business Address: 24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Huron St W
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LACH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lach (CPSO#: 121233 )
Business Address: 24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER LUCJAN LACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER LUCJAN LACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020