THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 03:56:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chatham-Kent Family Health Team
Chatham Medical Place
20 Emma St
Unit 209
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-2172
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jasmine Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dhaliwal (CPSO#: 121251 )
Business Address: 20 Emma St
Unit 209
Chatham ON N7L 5K5
5193542172

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chatham-Kent Family Health Team
Chatham Medical Place
20 Emma St
Unit 209
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-2172
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jasmine Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dhaliwal (CPSO#: 121251 )
Business Address: 20 Emma St
Unit 209
Chatham ON N7L 5K5
5193542172

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASMINE DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASMINE DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020