THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:36:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Division of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. Y. HAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Han (CPSO#: 121264 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Division of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. Y. HAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Han (CPSO#: 121264 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YAEJI HAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YAEJI HAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020