THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:29:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-860 Tecumseh Rd E
Parent Avenue Family Medicine
Suite 101
Windsor ON N8X 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 255-7118
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 273 Main St E
TMC Urgent Care Kingsville
Kingsville ON N9Y 1A7
Phone: (226) 526-5559
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-13278 Tecumseh Rd E
TMC Urgent Care
Suite 101
Tecumseh ON N8N 0C2
Phone: 519-979-5260
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TRISTAN CONCIATORI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Conciatori (CPSO#: 121296 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-860 Tecumseh Rd E
Parent Avenue Family Medicine
Suite 101
Windsor ON N8X 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 255-7118
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 273 Main St E
TMC Urgent Care Kingsville
Kingsville ON N9Y 1A7
Phone: (226) 526-5559
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-13278 Tecumseh Rd E
TMC Urgent Care
Suite 101
Tecumseh ON N8N 0C2
Phone: 519-979-5260
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TRISTAN CONCIATORI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Conciatori (CPSO#: 121296 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRISTAN ANTHONY CONCIATORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONCIATORI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRISTAN ANTHONY CONCIATORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONCIATORI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020