THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:12:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Division of Family Medicine
4001 Leslie St
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 89 Hastings Street North
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
Phone: 613-332-0660
Fax: 613-332-1551
Address: C-21 Essa Rd
Barrie ON L4N 3K4
Phone: 7057285433
Fax: 7057259360
Address: C-79 Dunlop St W
Barrie ON L4N 1A5
Phone: 7055034800
Fax: 7055034905
Address: 3874 Rebstock Road
Unit 2
Fort Erie Ontario L0S 1B0
Phone: 905-894-5151
Fax: 905-894-5152
Address: 381 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
RAAM Clinic
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 289-221-8523
Fax: 1-844-941-1983

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JOSHUA R FLETCHER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fletcher (CPSO#: 121310 )
Business Address: C-21 Essa Rd
Barrie ON L4N 3K4
7057285433 Extn: 7057259360

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Division of Family Medicine
4001 Leslie St
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 89 Hastings Street North
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
Phone: 613-332-0660
Fax: 613-332-1551
Address: C-21 Essa Rd
Barrie ON L4N 3K4
Phone: 7057285433
Fax: 7057259360
Address: C-79 Dunlop St W
Barrie ON L4N 1A5
Phone: 7055034800
Fax: 7055034905
Address: 3874 Rebstock Road
Unit 2
Fort Erie Ontario L0S 1B0
Phone: 905-894-5151
Fax: 905-894-5152
Address: 381 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
RAAM Clinic
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 289-221-8523
Fax: 1-844-941-1983

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JOSHUA R FLETCHER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fletcher (CPSO#: 121310 )
Business Address: C-21 Essa Rd
Barrie ON L4N 3K4
7057285433 Extn: 7057259360

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA RYAN FLETCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLETCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA RYAN FLETCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLETCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020