THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:59:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-2345
Fax: 4166332216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PEREZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Perez (CPSO#: 121317 )
Business Address: 180-4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4L 4Y7
Business Address: 545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 0C4
416-633-2345

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-2345
Fax: 4166332216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PEREZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Perez (CPSO#: 121317 )
Business Address: 180-4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4L 4Y7
Business Address: 545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 0C4
416-633-2345

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAILI PEREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAILI PEREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020