THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:23:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Government Rd
Wawa FHT
Wawa ON P0S 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058561313
Fax: 7058569550

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M J BRETON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Breton (CPSO#: 121421 )
Business Address: 17 Government Road
Wawa Ontario P0S 1K0
7058561313 Extn: 4449

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Government Rd
Wawa FHT
Wawa ON P0S 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058561313
Fax: 7058569550

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M J BRETON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Breton (CPSO#: 121421 )
Business Address: 17 Government Road
Wawa Ontario P0S 1K0
7058561313 Extn: 4449

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JACOB CHARLES BRETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRETON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JACOB CHARLES BRETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRETON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020