THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:55:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Medicine
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 822 5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 168 Reynolds Walk
Guelph Ontario N1G 3B9
Phone: 519 824 4120
Extension: 52131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 11-450 Westheights Drive
Driftwood Family Medicine
Kitchener Ontario N2N 1M5
Phone: 519 725 4070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. A. CULJAK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Culjak (CPSO#: 121450 )
Business Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 4J4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Medicine
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 822 5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 168 Reynolds Walk
Guelph Ontario N1G 3B9
Phone: 519 824 4120
Extension: 52131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 11-450 Westheights Drive
Driftwood Family Medicine
Kitchener Ontario N2N 1M5
Phone: 519 725 4070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. A. CULJAK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Culjak (CPSO#: 121450 )
Business Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 4J4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA CULJAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULJAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA CULJAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULJAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020