THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 169 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-905-945-2253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erin Blake Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blake (CPSO#: 121465 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 169 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-905-945-2253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erin Blake Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blake (CPSO#: 121465 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN SINEAD BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN SINEAD BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020