THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 02:55:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 715 Mackay St
Pembroke Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Tower D
4th Floor
Pembroke ON K8A 0C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-3422
Fax: 613-732-7115

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew J. Kutschke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kutschke (CPSO#: 121498 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 715 Mackay St
Pembroke Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Tower D
4th Floor
Pembroke ON K8A 0C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-3422
Fax: 613-732-7115

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew J. Kutschke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kutschke (CPSO#: 121498 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES KUTSCHKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUTSCHKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES KUTSCHKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUTSCHKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020