THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:33:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 581 Davis Dr
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Suite 201
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-3103
Fax: 905-853-2533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. QIN YUAN XU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Xu (CPSO#: 121504 )
Business Address: 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
905-853-3103

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 581 Davis Dr
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Suite 201
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-3103
Fax: 905-853-2533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. QIN YUAN XU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Xu (CPSO#: 121504 )
Business Address: 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
905-853-3103

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QIN YUAN XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QIN YUAN XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020