THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:52:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1010 Kennedy Cir
Milton ON L9T 0J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058648787
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR SHAZIA JABEEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jabeen (CPSO#: 121582 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1010 Kennedy Cir
Milton ON L9T 0J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058648787
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR SHAZIA JABEEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jabeen (CPSO#: 121582 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAZIA JABEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABEEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAZIA JABEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABEEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020