THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:47:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Edinburgh Medical School, College of Medicine and Veterinary Medicine, University of Edinburgh, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Harbour St
HealthOne Medical & Walk-In
Toronto ON M5J 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 613 0333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 225 Richmond St W
Toronto ON M5V 1W2
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 888-745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ANDREW M. HSIAO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hsiao (CPSO#: 121671 )
Business Address: 301-110 Harbour St
Toronto ON M5J 0B7
Business Address: 301-110 Harbour St
Toronto ON M5J 0B7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Edinburgh Medical School, College of Medicine and Veterinary Medicine, University of Edinburgh, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Harbour St
HealthOne Medical & Walk-In
Toronto ON M5J 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 613 0333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 225 Richmond St W
Toronto ON M5V 1W2
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 888-745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ANDREW M. HSIAO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hsiao (CPSO#: 121671 )
Business Address: 301-110 Harbour St
Toronto ON M5J 0B7
Business Address: 301-110 Harbour St
Toronto ON M5J 0B7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW MATTHEW HSIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW MATTHEW HSIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Edinburgh Medical School, College of Medicine and Veterinary Medicine, University of Edinburgh, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020