THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:46:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health
Hospitalist medicine
D2
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KHADIJA ZEHRA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zehra (CPSO#: 121681 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health
Hospitalist medicine
D2
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KHADIJA ZEHRA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zehra (CPSO#: 121681 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHADIJA ZEHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEHRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHADIJA ZEHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEHRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020