THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MASSOOME NAJAFI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Najafi (CPSO#: 121685 )
Business Address: 300-790 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Business Address: 501-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MASSOOME NAJAFI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Najafi (CPSO#: 121685 )
Business Address: 300-790 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Business Address: 501-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASSOOME NAJAFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAJAFI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASSOOME NAJAFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAJAFI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020