THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:10:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B12-350 Conestoga Blvd
Hespeler Medical Clinic
Cambridge ON N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-629-4615
Fax: 519-629-4630
Address: 2375 Homer Watson Boulevard
Cambridge Palliative and Frail Elder Care Associates
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0E9
Phone: 519-212-1688
Extension: 7
Fax: 844-789-2027

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaskarn Singh Sahota Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sahota (CPSO#: 121716 )
Business Address: B12-350 Conestoga Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 7L7
519-629-4617

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B12-350 Conestoga Blvd
Hespeler Medical Clinic
Cambridge ON N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-629-4615
Fax: 519-629-4630
Address: 2375 Homer Watson Boulevard
Cambridge Palliative and Frail Elder Care Associates
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0E9
Phone: 519-212-1688
Extension: 7
Fax: 844-789-2027

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaskarn Singh Sahota Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sahota (CPSO#: 121716 )
Business Address: B12-350 Conestoga Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 7L7
519-629-4617

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASKARN SINGH SAHOTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHOTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASKARN SINGH SAHOTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHOTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020