THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-206 Locke St S
Hamilton ON L8P 4B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-570-0440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 26 Blenheim Dr
Beauty Aesthetic
Stoney Creek ON L8E 1W2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Wellesley St W
301
Toronto ON M4Y 0G7
Phone: 416-413-7999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ELLE SURGENT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Surgent (CPSO#: 121731 )
Business Address: 1-1493 Centre Rd
Carlisle ON L0R 1H2
905-689-3301

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-206 Locke St S
Hamilton ON L8P 4B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-570-0440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 26 Blenheim Dr
Beauty Aesthetic
Stoney Creek ON L8E 1W2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Wellesley St W
301
Toronto ON M4Y 0G7
Phone: 416-413-7999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ELLE SURGENT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Surgent (CPSO#: 121731 )
Business Address: 1-1493 Centre Rd
Carlisle ON L0R 1H2
905-689-3301

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLE EVE SURGENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURGENT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLE EVE SURGENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURGENT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020