THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:06:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Dozois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dozois (CPSO#: 121807 )
Business Address: PO Box 909 Stn Main
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay Regional Health Centre
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Dozois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dozois (CPSO#: 121807 )
Business Address: PO Box 909 Stn Main
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay Regional Health Centre
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DANIEL DOZOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOZOIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DANIEL DOZOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOZOIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020