THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:30:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Ann St
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
Bracebridge ON P1L 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Ann St
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
Bracebridge ON P1L 2E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: COLE KRENSKY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Krensky (CPSO#: 121814 )
Business Address: 165 Pears Avenue
Unit 15
Toronto Ontario M5R 0C1
4165809980

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Ann St
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
Bracebridge ON P1L 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Ann St
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
Bracebridge ON P1L 2E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: COLE KRENSKY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Krensky (CPSO#: 121814 )
Business Address: 165 Pears Avenue
Unit 15
Toronto Ontario M5R 0C1
4165809980

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLE KRENSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRENSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLE KRENSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRENSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020