THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:47:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: Hanna, Najib-Georges Elias (Used Until: 14 Sep 2020)
Medical School: St. Joseph's University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Hanna, Najib-Georges Elias (Used Until: 14 Sep 2020)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH
Medical School: St. Joseph's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Joseph's University, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Aug 2022
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
10 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2020 to 09 Sep 2020
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
DATE: 10 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 09 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020