THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:28:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-465 Morden Rd
Dorval Medical Family Health Team
Oakville ON L6K 3W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 842-7154
Fax: (905) 842-3604

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nayak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nayak (CPSO#: 121883 )
Business Address: 104-465 Morden Rd
Oakville ON L6K 3W6
(905) 842-7154

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-465 Morden Rd
Dorval Medical Family Health Team
Oakville ON L6K 3W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 842-7154
Fax: (905) 842-3604

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nayak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nayak (CPSO#: 121883 )
Business Address: 104-465 Morden Rd
Oakville ON L6K 3W6
(905) 842-7154

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKANKSHA ANIL NAYAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKANKSHA ANIL NAYAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020