THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 11:19:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-565 Sanatorium Rd
Musicians' Clinics of Canada
Hamilton ON L9C 7N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 574-5444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 168 Reynolds Walk
J. T. Powell Building
Guelph ON N1G 4Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: COTTRELL CHONG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chong (CPSO#: 31249 ) Dr. K. Cottrell (CPSO#: 121929 )
Business Address: Sir William Osler Health Institute
Musicians' Clinics of Canada
201 - 565 Sanatorium Road
Hamilton Ontario L9C 7N4
(905) 574-5444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-565 Sanatorium Rd
Musicians' Clinics of Canada
Hamilton ON L9C 7N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 574-5444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 168 Reynolds Walk
J. T. Powell Building
Guelph ON N1G 4Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: COTTRELL CHONG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chong (CPSO#: 31249 ) Dr. K. Cottrell (CPSO#: 121929 )
Business Address: Sir William Osler Health Institute
Musicians' Clinics of Canada
201 - 565 Sanatorium Road
Hamilton Ontario L9C 7N4
(905) 574-5444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN HEATHER COTTRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COTTRELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN HEATHER COTTRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COTTRELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020