THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-133 King St W
Dundas ON L9H 1V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056286355
Fax: 9056280664

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Oct 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HIRA RAO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rao (CPSO#: 121946 )
Business Address: 201-133 King St W
Dundas ON L9H 1V3
(905) 628-6355

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-133 King St W
Dundas ON L9H 1V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056286355
Fax: 9056280664

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Oct 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HIRA RAO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rao (CPSO#: 121946 )
Business Address: 201-133 King St W
Dundas ON L9H 1V3
(905) 628-6355

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIRA RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIRA RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020