THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:25:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond St
Rm 2170
London ON N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196613030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EANNA CLIFFORD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Clifford (CPSO#: 121982 )
Business Address: 1151 Richmond Street
Rm 2170
London Ontario N6A 3K7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond St
Rm 2170
London ON N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196613030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EANNA CLIFFORD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Clifford (CPSO#: 121982 )
Business Address: 1151 Richmond Street
Rm 2170
London Ontario N6A 3K7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EANNA LIAM CLIFFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLIFFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EANNA LIAM CLIFFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLIFFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020