THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:05:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fotina Raptis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Raptis (CPSO#: 122032 )
Business Address: 101-532 Lake St
St Catharines ON L2N 4H4
9056460015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fotina Raptis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Raptis (CPSO#: 122032 )
Business Address: 101-532 Lake St
St Catharines ON L2N 4H4
9056460015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FOTINA RAPTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPTIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FOTINA RAPTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPTIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020