THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:10:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Madheea Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Siddiqi (CPSO#: 122037 )
Business Address: 942 Boyer Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5V 1X4
Business Address: 350 Queensdale Ave E
Hamilton ON L9A 1L6
437-972-5547

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Madheea Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Siddiqi (CPSO#: 122037 )
Business Address: 942 Boyer Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5V 1X4
Business Address: 350 Queensdale Ave E
Hamilton ON L9A 1L6
437-972-5547

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADHEEA TAWASSUL SIDDIQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADHEEA TAWASSUL SIDDIQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020