THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:06:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-170 Silvercreek Pky N
Guelph ON N1H 7P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-265-8882
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Qureshi (CPSO#: 122054 )
Business Address: 2-170 Silvercreek Pky N
Guelph ON N1H 7P7

Corporation Name: B. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-170 Silvercreek Pky N
Guelph ON N1H 7P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-265-8882
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Qureshi (CPSO#: 122054 )
Business Address: 2-170 Silvercreek Pky N
Guelph ON N1H 7P7

Corporation Name: B. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BILQUIS QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BILQUIS QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2020