THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kidcrew Medical
1440 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON M3B 3S6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Mortimer Court
Vaughan Ontario L4J 2P7
Phone: 4163585163
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aharon Lauterpacht Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lauterpacht (CPSO#: 122055 )
Business Address: 1400 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3S5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kidcrew Medical
1440 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON M3B 3S6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Mortimer Court
Vaughan Ontario L4J 2P7
Phone: 4163585163
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aharon Lauterpacht Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lauterpacht (CPSO#: 122055 )
Business Address: 1400 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3S5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Jan 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 27 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AHARON SIMCHA LAUTERPACHT may practise medicine independently in pediatrics in an outpatient setting, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AHARON SIMCHA LAUTERPACHT may practise medicine independently in pediatrics in an outpatient setting, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2020