THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 01:46:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manikkam-Cupido Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cupido (CPSO#: 114683 ) Dr. L. Manikkam (CPSO#: 122069 )
Business Address: 11-665 Harmony Rd
Corbyville ON K0K 1V0
6134035255

Corporation Name: BD Cupido Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Oct 2022

Corporation Name: Manikkam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manikkam-Cupido Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cupido (CPSO#: 114683 ) Dr. L. Manikkam (CPSO#: 122069 )
Business Address: 11-665 Harmony Rd
Corbyville ON K0K 1V0
6134035255

Corporation Name: BD Cupido Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Oct 2022

Corporation Name: Manikkam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIANE CAMILLA MANIKKAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANIKKAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIANE CAMILLA MANIKKAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANIKKAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2020