THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:55:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250-123 Third Ave
Timmins Academic Family Health Team
Timmins ON P4N 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-264-1313
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins and District Hospital
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
Phone: 705-267-2131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Camille Boulay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Boulay (CPSO#: 122089 )
Business Address: 250-123 Third Ave
Timmins ON P4N 1C6
705-264-1313

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250-123 Third Ave
Timmins Academic Family Health Team
Timmins ON P4N 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-264-1313
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins and District Hospital
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
Phone: 705-267-2131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Camille Boulay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Boulay (CPSO#: 122089 )
Business Address: 250-123 Third Ave
Timmins ON P4N 1C6
705-264-1313

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMILLE LUCIE MARIE BOULAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMILLE LUCIE MARIE BOULAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020