THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 22:51:34 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Met Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.E. KRAHN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Krahn (CPSO#: 122096 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
519-254-5577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Met Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.E. KRAHN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Krahn (CPSO#: 122096 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
519-254-5577

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RYAN EDWARD KRAHN may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RYAN EDWARD KRAHN may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020