THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:51:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Rd E
Office #c2-209
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cardarelli Leite Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cardarelli Leite (CPSO#: 122116 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
C2-200
London ON N6A 5W9
5198758000 Extn: 54965

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Rd E
Office #c2-209
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cardarelli Leite Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cardarelli Leite (CPSO#: 122116 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
C2-200
London ON N6A 5W9
5198758000 Extn: 54965

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Jan 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 30 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Leandro Cardarelli Leite may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
Imaging, Division of Diagnostic Radiology, University of Western
Ontario, in which Dr. Cardarelli Leite holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Cardarelli Leite no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Cardarelli
Leite's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Cardarelli Leite's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2027.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Leandro Cardarelli Leite may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
Imaging, Division of Diagnostic Radiology, University of Western
Ontario, in which Dr. Cardarelli Leite holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Cardarelli Leite no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Cardarelli
Leite's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Cardarelli Leite's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2020. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2027.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2027
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020